KY SB103 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on March 12 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-12 - signed by Governor (Acts Chapter 5)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [MS Word]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on March 12 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-12 - signed by Governor (Acts Chapter 5)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [MS Word]
Summary
Amend KRS 247.234 to require amusement ride and attractions applicants to list prior violations when obtaining a business identification number; declare that unpaid civil penalties assessed against amusement ride and attraction operators remain in effect
Title
AN ACT relating to amusement rides and attractions.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-12 | Senate | signed by Governor (Acts Chapter 5) |
2013-03-01 | Senate | delivered to Governor |
2013-03-01 | Senate | enrolled, signed by each presiding officer |
2013-03-01 | Senate | received in Senate |
2013-02-28 | House | 3rd reading, passed 100-0 |
2013-02-26 | House | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Thursday, February 28, 2013 |
2013-02-26 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2013-02-25 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar |
2013-02-22 | House | posting waived |
2013-02-22 | House | posted in committee |
2013-02-20 | House | to Agriculture & Small Business (H) |
2013-02-19 | House | received in House |
2013-02-15 | Senate | 3rd reading, passed 35-0 with committee amendment (1-title) |
2013-02-14 | Senate | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Friday, February 15, 2013 |
2013-02-13 | Senate | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2013-02-12 | Senate | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar with committee amendment (1-title) |
2013-02-11 | Senate | to Agriculture (S) |
2013-02-06 | Senate | introduced in Senate |