KY SB103 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 7 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-07 - signed by Governor (Acts, ch. 46)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [MS Word]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 7 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-07 - signed by Governor (Acts, ch. 46)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [MS Word]
Summary
Create a new section of KRS Chapter 214 to permit a caregiver of an individual who has diabetes to administer or assist with the self-administration of the medication listed if the caregiver has been trained and has the written authorization of the individual's health care practitioner; require the written authorization to be kept on file; exempt the health care practitioner and the caregiver from liability unless an injury is the result of negligence or misconduct; exempt the trained and authorized caregiver from laws related to the practice of nursing; permit a health care practitioner to train a caregiver.
Title
AN ACT relating to diabetes, and declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-07 | Senate | signed by Governor (Acts, ch. 46) |
2014-03-26 | Senate | delivered to Governor |
2014-03-26 | Senate | enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House |
2014-03-25 | Senate | enrolled, signed by President of the Senate |
2014-03-25 | Senate | received in Senate |
2014-03-25 | House | 3rd reading, passed 99-0 |
2014-03-17 | House | placed in the Consent Orders of the Day for Tuesday, March 25, 2014 |
2014-03-17 | House | taken from Rules |
2014-03-14 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2014-03-13 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar |
2014-02-18 | House | posted in committee |
2014-02-13 | House | to Health & Welfare (H) |
2014-02-12 | House | received in House |
2014-02-11 | Senate | 3rd reading, passed 38-0 with floor amendments (1-title) and (2) |
2014-02-10 | Senate | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Tuesday, February 11, 2014 |
2014-02-06 | Senate | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2014-02-05 | Senate | floor amendments (1-title) and (2) filed |
2014-02-05 | Senate | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar |
2014-01-29 | Senate | to Health & Welfare (S) |
2014-01-27 | Senate | introduced in Senate |