KY SB107 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 17 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-17 - signed by Governor (Acts Ch. 198)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 17 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-17 - signed by Governor (Acts Ch. 198)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Amends KRS 186.040 to direct $30 of the registration fee for vehicles in excess of 44,000 pounds to the county clerk of the county in which the truck is registered; amends KRS 186.050 to set registration fees for vehicles in excess of 44,000 pounds; creates a new section of KRS 186.400 to 186.640 to direct the state police to engage in a pilot project to provide operator’s license skills testing in five counties where testing is not currently offered, to set requirements for the state police, and to require that the state police report to the Legislative Research Commission by October 31, 2025, regarding program data, effect on existing testing efforts, and recommendations; amends KRS 186.480 to require that the Department of Kentucky State Police (KSP) include information about the organ donor program in educational materials for driver training; amends KRS 186.560 to require revocation of an operator’s license for certain highway work zone violations; amends KRS 189.010 to define “highway work zone”; amends KRS 189.221 and 189.2325 to conform; amends KRS 189.222 to provide a weight limit allowance of 400 pounds for any vehicle with an auxiliary power unit; amends KRS 189.2327 to increase fines for highway work zone traffic offenses; amends KRS 189.270 to limit the fee that the Transportation Cabinet may set for overdimensional permits to transport farm equipment; amends KRS 189.271, 189.2713, 189.2716, and 189.2717 to require that the Transportation Cabinet promulgate administrative regulations to set fees for overweight and overdimensional permits; amends KRS 189.290 to prohibit a person from operating a vehicle in or near a highway work zone in a manner that endangers persons or property and to provide that violators shall be subject to revocation of their operator’s license; amends KRS 189.340 to prohibit the operation of a truck tractor, trailer, or semitrailer in the far left lane of any roadway that has been divided into three or more clearly marked lanes for travel; amends KRS 189.930 to expand the requirement to move over or slow down when approaching an emergency or public safety vehicle to include any disabled vehicle displaying a warning signal; amends KRS 189.960 to require that operators of motor vehicles yield to workers in or near a highway work zone; amends KRS 189.990 to establish fines for causing physical injury or death to a person while operating a vehicle in or near a highway work zone; amends KRS 281.926 to require that towing companies submit their rate schedules to the nearest KSP post and all local law enforcement agencies in the companies’ service area in addition to making them available to the public upon request, and to direct that the KSP and local law enforcement agencies remove companies that do not comply with these requirements from their wrecker logs for a period of six months for the first violation and one year for any subsequent violation; and amends KRS 281.990 to allow the Transportation Cabinet to promulgate administrative regulations to set penalties for violations of KRS 281.920 to 281.936; APPROPRIATION; EFFECTIVE, in part, January 1, 2025.
Title
AN ACT relating to transportation and making an appropriation therefor.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-15 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading W/FINAL hcs1 RSN# 3328 (Y: 34 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-04-15 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 473 (Y: 91 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2024-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading W/scs2 RSN# 2920 (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-04-15 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 473 (Y: 91 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2024-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading W/scs2 RSN# 2920 (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-17 | Senate | signed by Governor (Acts Ch. 198) |
2024-04-15 | Senate | delivered to Governor |
2024-04-15 | Senate | enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House |
2024-04-15 | Senate | enrolled, signed by President of the Senate |
2024-04-15 | Senate | passed 34-1 |
2024-04-15 | Senate | Senate concurred in House Committee Substitute (1) |
2024-04-15 | Senate | posted for passage for concurrence in House Committee Substitute (1) |
2024-04-15 | Senate | to Rules (S) |
2024-04-15 | Senate | received in Senate |
2024-04-15 | House | 3rd reading, passed 91-3 with Committee Substitute (1) |
2024-04-15 | House | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for April 15 |
2024-04-15 | House | taken from Rules |
2024-04-15 | House | reported favorably, to Rules with Committee Substitute (1) |
2024-03-15 | House | recommitted to Appropriations & Revenue (H) |
2024-03-14 | House | floor amendment (1) filed |
2024-03-13 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2024-03-12 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar |
2024-03-01 | House | to Transportation (H) |
2024-02-22 | House | to Committee on Committees (H) |
2024-02-22 | House | received in House |
2024-02-21 | Senate | passed 35-0-1 with Committee Substitute (2) |
2024-02-21 | Senate | committee amendment withdrawn Committee Substitute (1) |
2024-02-21 | Senate | 3rd reading |
2024-02-15 | Senate | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Wednesday, February 21, 2024 |
2024-02-14 | Senate | reported favorably, to Rules with Committee Substitute (2) |
2024-02-05 | Senate | recommitted to Transportation (S) |
2024-01-25 | Senate | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2024-01-24 | Senate | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar with Committee Substitute (1) |
2024-01-16 | Senate | to Transportation (S) |
2024-01-11 | Senate | to Committee on Committees (S) |
2024-01-11 | Senate | introduced in Senate |
Subjects
Administrative Regulations and Proceedings
Appropriations
Budget and Financial Administration
County Clerks
Effective Dates, Delayed
Firefighters and Fire Departments
Highways, Streets, and Bridges
Motor Carriers
Motor Vehicles
Police, State
State Agencies
Taxation
Taxation, Property
Transportation
Appropriations
Budget and Financial Administration
County Clerks
Effective Dates, Delayed
Firefighters and Fire Departments
Highways, Streets, and Bridges
Motor Carriers
Motor Vehicles
Police, State
State Agencies
Taxation
Taxation, Property
Transportation