KY SB107 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 26 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-26 - signed by Governor (Acts Ch. 160)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [MS Word]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 26 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-26 - signed by Governor (Acts Ch. 160)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [MS Word]
Summary
Create new sections of KRS Chapter 218A to prohibit possession of, trafficking in, and cultivation of salvia and impose penalties; amend KRS 218A.010 to define "salvia"; amend KRS 218A.050 to include salvia as a Schedule I controlled substance; amend KRS 217.065, relating to misbranded drug or device, to include salvia; amend KRS 218A.141 relating to additional penalties for trafficking, to include trafficking in salvia; amend KRS 218A.1411, relating to trafficking in a controlled substance in or near school, to exclude offenses relating to salvia; amend KRS 218A.276, relating to a rehabilitation program for possessors of marijuana, to include possessors of salvia; amend KRS 218A.410, relating to property subject to forfeiture, to exclude misdemeanor offenses relating to salvia in certain circumstances; amend KRS 218A.500 to include in the definition of "drug paraphernalia" certain items used with salvia; amend KRS 218A.992, relating to enhancement of penalty for drug offense when in possession of a firearm, to exclude offenses involving salvia; amend KRS 530.064, relating to unlawful transaction with a minor in the first degree, to exclude activity involving salvia; amend various other sections to conform; EMERGENCY.
Title
AN ACT relating to crimes and punishments and declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-26 | signed by Governor (Acts Ch. 160) | |
2010-04-15 | delivered to Governor | |
2010-04-15 | enrolled, signed by each presiding officer | |
2010-04-15 | received in Senate | |
2010-04-15 | Bill passed 97-1 with Committee Substitute, floor amendment (2) | |
2010-04-14 | received in House | |
2010-04-14 | passed 37-0 | |
2010-04-14 | Senate concurred in House Committee Substitute, floor amendment (2) | |
2010-04-14 | posted for passage for concurrence in House Committee Substitute, floor amendments (2) for Wednesday, April 14, 2010 | |
2010-04-14 | received in Senate | |
2010-04-01 | House refused to recede from Committee Substitute, floor amendment (2) | |
2010-04-01 | House receded from floor amendment (1) | |
2010-03-29 | posted for passage for receding from House Committee Substitute, floor amendments (1) and (2) | |
2010-03-29 | received in House | |
2010-03-29 | Senate refused to concur in House Committee Substitute, floor amendments (1) and (2) | |
2010-03-29 | posted for passage for concurrence in House Committee Substitute, floor amendments (1) and (2) | |
2010-03-26 | received in Senate | |
2010-03-26 | 3rd reading, passed 90-1 with Committee Substitute, floor amendments (1) and (2) | |
2010-03-26 | floor amendment (3) filed to Committee Substitute | |
2010-03-26 | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Friday, March 26, 2010 | |
2010-03-25 | floor amendments (1) and (2) filed to Committee Substitute | |
2010-03-25 | 2nd reading, to Rules | |
2010-03-24 | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar with Committee Substitute | |
2010-03-15 | posted in committee | |
2010-03-08 | to Judiciary (H) | |
2010-03-04 | received in House | |
2010-03-04 | passed 37-0 with Committee Substitute | |
2010-03-04 | committee amendment (1-title) withdrawn | |
2010-03-04 | 3rd reading | |
2010-03-03 | passed over and retained in the Orders of the Day | |
2010-03-02 | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Wednesday, March 3, 2010 | |
2010-02-26 | 2nd reading, to Rules | |
2010-02-25 | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar with Committee Substitute, committee amendment (1-title) | |
2010-01-27 | to Judiciary (S) | |
2010-01-26 | introduced in Senate |
Kentucky State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/10RS/SB107.htm |
Text | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/10RS/SB107/bill.doc |