KY SB110 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 6 2024 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-03-15 - to Judiciary (H)
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 6 2024 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-03-15 - to Judiciary (H)
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Amend KRS 403.211 to allow a child support action to be filed at any time following conception in the county where the mother resides.
Title
AN ACT relating to child support.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-05 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading W/scs1 RSN# 2957 (Y: 36 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-15 | House | to Judiciary (H) |
2024-03-06 | House | to Committee on Committees (H) |
2024-03-06 | House | received in House |
2024-03-05 | Senate | 3rd reading, passed 36-2 with Committee Substitute (1) |
2024-03-01 | Senate | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Tuesday, March 05, 2024 |
2024-02-28 | Senate | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2024-02-27 | Senate | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar with Committee Substitute (1) |
2024-01-22 | Senate | to Families & Children (S) |
2024-01-16 | Senate | to Committee on Committees (S) |
2024-01-16 | Senate | introduced in Senate |