KY SB117 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on April 9 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-09 - signed by Governor (Acts, ch. 79)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on April 9 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-09 - signed by Governor (Acts, ch. 79)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [PDF]
Summary
Create a new section of Subtitle 9 of KRS Chapter 304 to require a pharmacy benefit manager to obtain a license; amend KRS 304.17A-161 to define maximum allowable cost and amend the definition of pharmacy benefit manager; amend KRS 304.17A-162 to provide for an appeal process, price updates, and administrative regulations; require review of the maximum allowable cost at least every 7 instead of 14 days; create new sections of Subtitle 17A of KRS Chapter 304 to establish licensure and application requirements for pharmacy benefit managers; require administrative regulations for the licensing process; provide for fees to cover the costs of enforcement; require adherence to other subtitles of KRS Chapter 304.
Title
AN ACT relating to pharmacy benefit management.
Sponsors
Sen. George Wise [R] | Sen. Jared Carpenter [R] | Sen. Danny Carroll [R] | Sen. C.B. Embry [R] |
Sen. Jimmy Higdon [R] | Sen. Stan Humphries [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-09 | Senate | signed by Governor (Acts, ch. 79) |
2016-03-29 | Senate | delivered to Governor |
2016-03-29 | Senate | enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House |
2016-03-28 | Senate | enrolled, signed by President of the Senate |
2016-03-25 | Senate | received in Senate |
2016-03-25 | House | 3rd reading, passed 97-0 |
2016-03-24 | House | floor amendment (1) withdrawn |
2016-03-24 | House | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Friday, March 25, 2016 |
2016-03-24 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2016-03-23 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar |
2016-03-21 | House | posted in committee |
2016-03-18 | House | floor amendment (1) filed |
2016-03-16 | House | posting waived |
2016-03-16 | House | to Banking & Insurance (H) |
2016-03-15 | House | received in House |
2016-03-14 | Senate | 3rd reading, passed 38-0 with Committee Substitute (1) |
2016-03-11 | Senate | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Monday, March 14, 2016 as a Consent Bill |
2016-03-11 | Senate | reported favorably, to Rules with Committee Substitute (1) |
2016-02-11 | Senate | recommitted to Appropriations & Revenue (S) |
2016-02-11 | Senate | taken from Rules |
2016-02-04 | Senate | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2016-02-03 | Senate | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar |
2016-01-25 | Senate | to Health & Welfare (S) |
2016-01-21 | Senate | introduced in Senate |