KY SB119 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 27 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-27 - signed by Governor (Acts, ch. 28)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 27 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-27 - signed by Governor (Acts, ch. 28)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
Create a new section of KRS Chapter 150 to define "cervid meat processor"; require cervid meat processors to dispose of waste or unused material produced from processing cervid meat in the same manners as required for livestock, poultry, and fish carcasses under KRS 257.160; amend KRS 150.990 to establish penalties; amend KRS 257.160 to conform.
Title
AN ACT relating to cervid meat processors.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-14 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 306 (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2018-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading W/SCS 1 RSN# 447 (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RSN# 447 (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading W/SCS 1 RSN# 447 (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RSN# 447 (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-27 | Senate | signed by Governor (Acts, ch. 28) |
2018-03-15 | Senate | delivered to Governor |
2018-03-15 | Senate | enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House |
2018-03-15 | Senate | enrolled, signed by President of the Senate |
2018-03-15 | Senate | received in Senate |
2018-03-14 | House | 3rd reading, passed 95-0 |
2018-03-13 | House | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Wednesday, March 14, 2018 |
2018-03-09 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2018-03-08 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar |
2018-03-06 | House | posted in committee |
2018-02-26 | House | to Tourism & Outdoor Recreation (H) |
2018-02-22 | House | received in House |
2018-02-21 | Senate | 3rd reading, passed 35-0 with Committee Substitute (1) |
2018-02-15 | Senate | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Wednesday, February 21, 2018 |
2018-02-14 | Senate | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2018-02-13 | Senate | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar with Committee Substitute (1) |
2018-02-01 | Senate | to Agriculture (S) |
2018-01-31 | Senate | introduced in Senate |