KY SB122 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on March 30 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-30 - became law without Governor's Signature (Acts, ch. 39)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on March 30 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-30 - became law without Governor's Signature (Acts, ch. 39)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
Amend KRS 15A.350 to require that standards for motorcycle riding courses be prescribed by the National Highway Traffic Safety Administration; amend 15A.352 to require the Motorcycle Safety Education Commission to publish a list of approved rider and instructor training courses; amend KRS 15A.354 to allow an instructor to be certified by the governing body of an approved program; remove restrictions preventing a person with a felony conviction from becoming an instructor; amend KRS 15A.356 to allow the Justice and Public Safety Cabinet to utilize up to 10% of available program funds each fiscal year to defray its own expenses incurred in offering motorcycle rider courses; amend KRS 15A.358 to allow the Justice and Public Safety Cabinet to utilize up to 10% of available program funds each fiscal year for administrative costs; amend KRS 15A.362 to require the Motorcycle Safety Education Commission to include a representative of the Transportation Cabinet, rather than a representative of the cabinet's Division of Driver Licensing; amend KRS 15A.366 to require that the annual report contain additional information regarding applicants and students; APPROPRIATION.
Title
AN ACT relating to motorcycle safety education and making an appropriation therefor.
Sponsors
Sen. C.B. Embry [R] | Sen. John Schickel [R] | Sen. Dan Seum [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-03-16 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 339 (Y: 87 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2018-02-26 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RSN# 467 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-02-26 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RSN# 467 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-30 | Senate | became law without Governor's Signature (Acts, ch. 39) |
2018-03-29 | Senate | filed without Governor's signature with the Secretary of State |
2018-03-19 | Senate | delivered to Governor |
2018-03-19 | Senate | enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House |
2018-03-19 | Senate | enrolled, signed by President of the Senate |
2018-03-19 | Senate | received in Senate |
2018-03-16 | House | 3rd reading, passed 87-0 |
2018-03-15 | House | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Friday, March 16, 2018 |
2018-03-14 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2018-03-13 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar |
2018-03-02 | House | posted in committee |
2018-03-01 | House | to Transportation (H) |
2018-02-27 | House | received in House |
2018-02-26 | Senate | 3rd reading, passed 36-0 |
2018-02-23 | Senate | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Monday, February 26, 2018 |
2018-02-15 | Senate | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2018-02-14 | Senate | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar |
2018-02-02 | Senate | to Transportation (S) |
2018-02-01 | Senate | introduced in Senate |
Kentucky State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/18RS/SB122.htm |
Text | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/recorddocuments/bill/18RS/SB122/bill.pdf |
Roll Call | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/18RS/SB122/vote_history.pdf |