KY SB123 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 8 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-02-26 - returned to State & Local Government (S)
Pending: Senate State & Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [MS Word]
Status: Introduced on February 8 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-02-26 - returned to State & Local Government (S)
Pending: Senate State & Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [MS Word]
Summary
Reclassify the City of Eddyville, in Lyon County, with a population of 2555, from a city of the fifth class to a city of the fourth class, which requires a population of 3,001 to 7,999.
Title
AN ACT reclassifying the City of Eddyville.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-02-26 | Senate | returned to State & Local Government (S) |
2013-02-26 | Senate | 2nd reading |
2013-02-26 | Senate | taken from State & Local Government (S) |
2013-02-25 | Senate | returned to State & Local Government (S) |
2013-02-25 | Senate | 1st reading |
2013-02-25 | Senate | taken from State & Local Government (S) |
2013-02-12 | Senate | to State & Local Government (S) |
2013-02-08 | Senate | introduced in Senate |
Kentucky State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/13RS/SB123.htm |
Text | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/13RS/SB123/bill.doc |