KY SB123 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 11 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-11 - signed by Governor (Acts ch. 9)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 11 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-11 - signed by Governor (Acts ch. 9)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Amend KRS 12.020 relating to the Cabinet for Health and Family Services to restructure units within the cabinet; amend KRS 194A.030 related to the Office of the Secretary of the Cabinet for Health and Family Services to restructure units and establish functions; create a new section of KRS Chapter 194A to establish the Division of Telehealth Services; confirm Executive Orders 2019-286, 2019-466, and 2019-719.
Title
AN ACT relating to reorganization.
Sponsors
Sen. Alice Kerr [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-03-05 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading W/hcs Final Passage RSN# 1287 (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-02-28 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 157 (Y: 81 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 17) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RSN# 1225 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-28 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 157 (Y: 81 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 17) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RSN# 1225 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-11 | Senate | signed by Governor (Acts ch. 9) |
2020-03-06 | Senate | delivered to Governor |
2020-03-06 | Senate | enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House |
2020-03-06 | Senate | enrolled, signed by President of the Senate |
2020-03-05 | Senate | passed 35-0 |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Senate concurred in House Committee Substitute (1) |
2020-03-04 | Senate | posted for passage for concurrence in House Committee Substitute (1) for Thursday, March 5, 2020 |
2020-03-02 | Senate | to Rules (S) |
2020-03-02 | Senate | received in Senate |
2020-02-28 | House | 3rd reading, passed 81-0 with Committee Substitute (1) |
2020-02-24 | House | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Tuesday, February 25, 2020 |
2020-02-21 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2020-02-20 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar with Committee Substitute (1) |
2020-02-18 | House | posted in committee |
2020-02-13 | House | to Health and Family Services (H) |
2020-02-11 | House | received in House |
2020-02-11 | Senate | 3rd reading, passed 38-0 |
2020-02-10 | Senate | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Tuesday, February 11, 2020 |
2020-02-06 | Senate | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2020-02-05 | Senate | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar |
2020-01-31 | Senate | to Health & Welfare (S) |
2020-01-29 | Senate | introduced in Senate |
Subjects
Aged Persons and Aging
Governor
Health and Medical Services
Medicaid
Public Assistance
Reorganization
State Agencies
Governor
Health and Medical Services
Medicaid
Public Assistance
Reorganization
State Agencies