KY SB124 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 18 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-02-22 - to Education (H)
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [MS Word]
Status: Engrossed on February 18 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-02-22 - to Education (H)
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [MS Word]
Summary
Create a new section of KRS Chapter 156 to require the Kentucky Department of Education to develop a teacher selection training module; require the department to provide training to all principals; require the department to develop and make available a training module update; allow credit hours to be given for completing initial and update training.
Title
AN ACT relating to selection of school personnel.
Sponsors
Sen. Mike Wilson [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-02-22 | to Education (H) | |
2011-02-18 | received in House | |
2011-02-17 | 3rd reading, passed 35-1 | |
2011-02-17 | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Thursday, February 17, 2011 | |
2011-02-16 | reported favorably, to Rules | |
2011-02-15 | returned to Education (S) | |
2011-02-15 | 2nd reading | |
2011-02-15 | taken from Education (S) | |
2011-02-14 | returned to Education (S) | |
2011-02-14 | 1st reading | |
2011-02-14 | taken from Education (S) | |
2011-02-10 | to Education (S) | |
2011-02-08 | introduced in Senate |
Kentucky State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/11RS/SB124.htm |
Text | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/11RS/SB124/bill.doc |