KY SB124 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 26 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-03-06 - reported favorably, to Rules as a Consent Bill
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [MS Word]
Status: Engrossed on February 26 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-03-06 - reported favorably, to Rules as a Consent Bill
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [MS Word]
Summary
Amend KRS 95.015 to extend the jurisdiction of police in cities of the sixth class to the entire county, the same as in cities of the other classes.
Title
AN ACT relating to city police.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-06 | House | reported favorably, to Rules as a Consent Bill |
2013-03-05 | House | returned to Local Government (H) |
2013-03-05 | House | 2nd reading |
2013-03-05 | House | taken from Local Government (H) |
2013-03-04 | House | posted in committee |
2013-03-04 | House | returned to Local Government (H) |
2013-03-04 | House | 1st reading |
2013-03-04 | House | taken from Local Government (H) |
2013-02-27 | House | to Local Government (H) |
2013-02-26 | House | received in House |
2013-02-26 | Senate | 3rd reading, passed 36-0 |
2013-02-25 | Senate | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Tuesday, February 26, 2013 |
2013-02-21 | Senate | reported favorably, 2nd reading, to Rules |
2013-02-20 | Senate | returned to Judiciary (S) |
2013-02-20 | Senate | 1st reading |
2013-02-20 | Senate | taken from Judiciary (S) |
2013-02-13 | Senate | to Judiciary (S) |
2013-02-08 | Senate | introduced in Senate |
Kentucky State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/13RS/SB124.htm |
Text | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/13RS/SB124/bill.doc |
Supplement | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/13RS/SB124/vote_history.pdf |