KY SB124 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 24-8)
Status: Passed on April 8 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-08 - signed by Governor (Acts Ch. 153)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 24-8)
Status: Passed on April 8 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-08 - signed by Governor (Acts Ch. 153)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Amend KRS 281A.160 and 186.635 to allow a person whose valid Kentucky commercial driver's license or operator's license has been expired for less than five years to renew the license without having to take knowledge and skills tests; set requirements for application for renewal; EMERGENCY.
Title
AN ACT relating to transportation and declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-30 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RSN# 2286 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-03-29 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 416 (Y: 80 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2022-03-29 - House - House: Suspend the Rules RCS# 415 (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 27) [PASS]
2022-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading W/scs1 RSN# 2049 (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-03-29 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 416 (Y: 80 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2022-03-29 - House - House: Suspend the Rules RCS# 415 (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 27) [PASS]
2022-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading W/scs1 RSN# 2049 (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-08 | Senate | signed by Governor (Acts Ch. 153) |
2022-03-30 | Senate | delivered to Governor |
2022-03-30 | Senate | enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House |
2022-03-30 | Senate | enrolled, signed by President of the Senate |
2022-03-30 | Senate | passed 36-0 |
2022-03-30 | Senate | Senate concurred in House Committee Substitute (1), Committee Amendment (1-title) and Floor Amendments (1) and (2) |
2022-03-30 | Senate | posted for passage for concurrence in House Floor Amendments (1) and (2), Committee Substitute (1) and Committee Amendment (1-title) |
2022-03-29 | Senate | to Rules (S) |
2022-03-29 | Senate | received in Senate |
2022-03-29 | House | 3rd reading, passed 80-14 with Committee Substitute (1), Floor Amendments (1) and (2), and Committee Amendment (1-title) |
2022-03-29 | House | floor amendment (2) filed |
2022-03-25 | House | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Tuesday, March 29, 2022 |
2022-03-24 | House | floor amendment (1) filed to Committee Substitute |
2022-03-24 | House | reported favorably, 2nd reading, to Rules with Committee Substitute (1) and Committee Amendment (1-title) |
2022-03-23 | House | returned to Transportation (H) |
2022-03-23 | House | 1st reading |
2022-03-23 | House | taken from Transportation (H) |
2022-03-04 | House | to Transportation (H) |
2022-02-23 | House | to Committee on Committees (H) |
2022-02-23 | House | received in House |
2022-02-22 | Senate | 3rd reading, passed 33-0 with Committee Substitute (1) |
2022-02-18 | Senate | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Tuesday, February 22, 2022 |
2022-02-17 | Senate | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2022-02-16 | Senate | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar with Committee Substitute (1) |
2022-01-31 | Senate | to Transportation (S) |
2022-01-27 | Senate | to Committee on Committees (S) |
2022-01-27 | Senate | introduced in Senate |