KY SB125 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-11 - floor amendment (1) filed
Pending: House Committee On Committees Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-11 - floor amendment (1) filed
Pending: House Committee On Committees Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Create new sections of KRS Chapter 525 to define terms; require peace officers and animal control officers to serve notice of seizure of an animal subjected to cruelty; create procedure for seizing agencies to petition a court to order payment of animal care costs by owner; establish penalties; prohibit the destruction of seized animals, except for humane reasons determined by veterinarian; amend KRS 258.215 to require owners be responsible for cost of care of an impounded animal.
Title
AN ACT relating to the costs incurred by animal care organizations.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-07 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading W/sfa1 RSN# 2097 (Y: 24 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-11 | House | floor amendment (1) filed |
2022-03-08 | House | to Committee on Committees (H) |
2022-03-08 | House | received in House |
2022-03-07 | Senate | passed 24-7 with Floor Amendment (1) |
2022-03-07 | Senate | floor amendment (2) defeated |
2022-03-07 | Senate | 3rd reading |
2022-03-04 | Senate | passed over and retained in the Orders of the Day |
2022-03-03 | Senate | floor amendments (1) and (2) filed |
2022-03-02 | Senate | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Friday, March 04, 2022 |
2022-03-02 | Senate | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2022-03-01 | Senate | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar |
2022-02-15 | Senate | to Agriculture (S) |
2022-02-10 | Senate | to Committee on Committees (S) |
2022-02-10 | Senate | introduced in Senate |
Subjects
Animals, Livestock, and Poultry
Civil Actions
Civil Procedure
Crimes and Punishments
Criminal Procedure
Dogs
Horses and Horse Racing
Local Mandate
Peace Officers and Law Enforcement
Civil Actions
Civil Procedure
Crimes and Punishments
Criminal Procedure
Dogs
Horses and Horse Racing
Local Mandate
Peace Officers and Law Enforcement