KY SB132 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-03-26 - returned to Education (H)
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [MS Word]
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-03-26 - returned to Education (H)
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [MS Word]
Summary
Amend KRS 161.790 to clarify the causes by which a contract of a teacher may be terminated; require the commissioner of education to initiate the appropriate due process procedures in response to a teacher's appeal of a superintendent's termination charge; create a new section of KRS Chapter 161 to establish hearing procedures and appointment of hearing officers for the appeal of a termination case.
Title
AN ACT relating to due process for teachers.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-26 | returned to Education (H) | |
2012-03-26 | 1st reading | |
2012-03-26 | taken from Education (H) | |
2012-03-20 | posted in committee | |
2012-03-08 | to Education (H) | |
2012-03-07 | received in House | |
2012-03-06 | 3rd reading, passed 23-11 with committee amendment (1) | |
2012-03-06 | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Tuesday, March 6, 2012 | |
2012-02-24 | 2nd reading, to Rules | |
2012-02-23 | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar with committee amendment (1) | |
2012-02-06 | to Education (S) | |
2012-02-01 | introduced in Senate |
Kentucky State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/12RS/SB132.htm |
Text | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/12RS/SB132/bill.doc |