KY SB132 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 27 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-18 - floor amendment (1) filed
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 27 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-18 - floor amendment (1) filed
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
Amend KRS 45A.030 and 45A.075 and create a new section of KRS Chapter 45A, the Kentucky Model Procurement Code, to provide an explicit framework for the use of public-private partnerships (P3s) as an alternative method of procurement, construction, and financing of capital projects and services by state government; define terms and establish procedures; require the promulgation of administrative regulations relating to P3 procurement; establish certain oversight, reporting, and General Assembly authorization requirements; amend KRS 65.025 and create a new section of KRS Chapter 65 to similarly provide an explicit framework for the use of P3s as an alternative method of procurement by local governments; define terms and establish procedures; establish the Kentucky Local Government Public-Private Partnership Board and require its review and approval of certain P3 agreements proposed by local governments; amend KRS 175B.005, 175B.010, 175B.020, 175B.025 175B.030, 175B.035, 175B.040, 175B.045 and 175B.095 and create a new section of KRS Chapter 175B to provide for the use of P3 procurement pursuant to that chapter as an alternative method for developing, constructing, operating and financing certain major transportation projects; define terms and amend the definition of a project to align with current federal usage; establish procedures and oversight, reporting, and General Assembly authorization requirements; make numerous conforming changes; prohibit any authority from authorizing tolls for any project involving the interstate highway system that connects the Commonwealth with the State of Ohio; EMERGENCY.
Title
AN ACT relating to public-private partnerships and declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-18 | Senate | floor amendment (1) filed |
2016-03-11 | Senate | returned to Economic Development, Tourism & Labor (S) |
2016-03-11 | Senate | 2nd reading |
2016-03-11 | Senate | taken from Economic Development, Tourism & Labor (S) |
2016-03-10 | Senate | returned to Economic Development, Tourism & Labor (S) |
2016-03-10 | Senate | 1st reading |
2016-03-10 | Senate | taken from Economic Development, Tourism & Labor (S) |
2016-01-29 | Senate | to Economic Development, Tourism & Labor (S) |
2016-01-27 | Senate | introduced in Senate |
Kentucky State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/16RS/SB132.htm |
Text | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/16RS/SB132/bill.pdf |
Amendment | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/16RS/SB132/SFA1.pdf |