KY SB161 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 14 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-02-27 - returned to Transportation (S)
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [MS Word]
Status: Introduced on February 14 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-02-27 - returned to Transportation (S)
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [MS Word]
Summary
Amend KRS 186.020, 186.411, 186,420, and 174.500 to include gender-neutral references.
Title
AN ACT relating to transportation.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-02-27 | Senate | returned to Transportation (S) |
2013-02-27 | Senate | 2nd reading |
2013-02-27 | Senate | taken from Transportation (S) |
2013-02-26 | Senate | returned to Transportation (S) |
2013-02-26 | Senate | 1st reading |
2013-02-26 | Senate | taken from Transportation (S) |
2013-02-19 | Senate | to Transportation (S) |
2013-02-14 | Senate | introduced in Senate |
Kentucky State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/13RS/SB161.htm |
Text | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/13RS/SB161/bill.doc |