KY SB161 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 23 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-07 - posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Wednesday, March 8, 2017
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 23 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-07 - posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Wednesday, March 8, 2017
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
Amend KRS 160.380 to allow the superintendent to determine whether a national background check is required for each classified initial hire as a condition of employment.
Title
AN ACT relating to school employees.
Sponsors
Sen. Mike Wilson [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-07 | House | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Wednesday, March 8, 2017 |
2017-03-06 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2017-03-03 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar |
2017-03-01 | House | posted in committee |
2017-02-27 | House | to Education (H) |
2017-02-23 | House | received in House |
2017-02-23 | Senate | 3rd reading, passed 38-0 |
2017-02-22 | Senate | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Thursday, February 23, 2017 |
2017-02-17 | Senate | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2017-02-16 | Senate | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar |
2017-02-14 | Senate | to Education (S) |
2017-02-13 | Senate | introduced in Senate |
Kentucky State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/17RS/SB161.htm |
Text | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/recorddocuments/bill/17RS/SB161/bill.pdf |
Supplement | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/17RS/SB161/vote_history.pdf |