KY SB161 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 6 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-12 - posted in committee
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 6 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-12 - posted in committee
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Amend KRS 510.010 to define "registrant" and "adult intermediary"; amend KRS 510.155 to include communications with adult intermediaries for minors and enhance punishment if the minor or perceived minor is under 12 years old, the offender is a registered sex offender, or a person travels into the Commonwealth for the purpose of procuring or promoting the use of a minor.
Title
AN ACT relating to crimes and punishments.
Sponsors
Sen. Alice Kerr [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-03-05 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading W/sfa1 RSN# 1284 (Y: 34 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-12 | House | posted in committee |
2020-03-09 | House | to Judiciary (H) |
2020-03-06 | House | received in House |
2020-03-05 | Senate | 3rd reading, passed 34-1 with floor amendment (1) |
2020-03-04 | Senate | passed over and retained in the Orders of the Day |
2020-03-02 | Senate | floor amendment (1) filed |
2020-03-02 | Senate | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Wednesday, March 4, 2020 |
2020-02-28 | Senate | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2020-02-27 | Senate | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar |
2020-02-13 | Senate | to Judiciary (S) |
2020-02-11 | Senate | introduced in Senate |