KY SB176 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 21 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-21 - signed by Governor (Acts, ch. 55)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 21 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-21 - signed by Governor (Acts, ch. 55)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
Create a new section of KRS Chapter 186A to allow the titling of military surplus vehicles; set provisions for titling; require the Transportation Cabinet to promulgate administrative regulations pertaining to the titling of these vehicles; amend KRS 186A.115 to require military surplus vehicles to be inspected prior to titling; require the Transportation Cabinet to promulgate administrative regulations relating to inspection and modifications; require the Transportation Cabinet to create a new inspection form for military surplus vehicles; make technical corrections; amend KRS 186.010 to define "military surplus vehicle"; specify that a military surplus vehicle is a motor vehicle.
Title
AN ACT relating to military surplus vehicles.
Sponsors
Sen. Steve West [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-21 | Senate | signed by Governor (Acts, ch. 55) |
2017-03-14 | Senate | delivered to Governor |
2017-03-14 | Senate | enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House |
2017-03-14 | Senate | enrolled, signed by President of the Senate |
2017-03-14 | Senate | received in Senate |
2017-03-14 | House | 3rd reading, passed 97-0 |
2017-03-08 | House | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Tuesday, March 14, 2017 |
2017-03-08 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2017-03-07 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar |
2017-03-03 | House | posted in committee |
2017-03-02 | House | to Transportation (H) |
2017-02-28 | House | received in House |
2017-02-28 | Senate | 3rd reading, passed 37-0 with floor amendment (1) |
2017-02-27 | Senate | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Tuesday, February 28, 2017 |
2017-02-23 | Senate | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2017-02-22 | Senate | floor amendment (1) filed |
2017-02-22 | Senate | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar |
2017-02-14 | Senate | to Transportation (S) |
2017-02-13 | Senate | introduced in Senate |