KY SB178 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 14 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-27 - recommitted to Judiciary (S)
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 14 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-27 - recommitted to Judiciary (S)
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
Amend KRS 382.110 to allow for authentic photocopies of powers of attorney or revocations of powers-of-attorney to be certified as a true copy; amend KRS 382.370 to limit powers of attorney to listing only one attorney in fact, except it may list contingent attorneys-in-fact, and void any provision which grants authority to an attorney-in-fact to execute additional powers of attorney.
Title
AN ACT relating to power of attorney to convey or release property.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-27 | Senate | recommitted to Judiciary (S) |
2017-02-22 | Senate | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2017-02-21 | Senate | floor amendment (1) filed |
2017-02-21 | Senate | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar |
2017-02-15 | Senate | to Judiciary (S) |
2017-02-14 | Senate | introduced in Senate |