KY SB181 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 6 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-14 - reported favorably, 2nd reading, to Rules with Committee Substitute (1)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 6 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-14 - reported favorably, 2nd reading, to Rules with Committee Substitute (1)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Amend KRS 42.545 to delete the Kentucky Health and Geriatric Authority; amend KRS 42.720, 42.726, 42.728, and 61.8715 to delete reference to the Statewide Strategic Planning Committee for Children in Placement; amend KRS 154.20-020 to delete reference to building a one hundred bed inpatient mental health facility in eastern Kentucky; amend KRS 194A.050, 194A.180, and 194A.190 to delete reference to the Public Health Services Advisory Council; amend KRS 199.894 to change definition of child-care center and family child-care home; amend KRS 199.896 to add exemption from licensure for instructional programs; amend KRS 200.550 to make technical correction; amend KRS 205.178 to change reporting requirement; amend KRS 209.032 to delete boarding homes from definition of vulnerable adult service provider; amend KRS 209.552 to change flu immunization requirements for long-term care facilities; amend KRS 209.554 to change long-term care facility purchase of vaccines; change reporting requirements; amend KRS 211.1752 to delete appeals hearings from the local Health Department Employment Personnel Council duties; amend KRS 211.990 to increase penalties for violations of KRS 211.842 to 211.852 relating to radiation control; amend KRS 216.2920 to change definitions of ambulatory facility and health-care provider; amend KRS 216.2925 to conform; amend KRS 216.2980 to delete the Department for Public health from reporting; amend KRS 216B.990 to delete penalties relating to boarding homes; amend KRS 342.375 to conform; repeal KRS 194.245, 194A.140, 194A.145, 194A.146, 194A.200, 199.8992, 200.662, 205.179, 210.271, 211.215, 216.2960, 216.750, 216.760, 216.770, 216.780, 216.800, 216.803, 216.805, 216.807, 216.810, 216.813, 216.815, 216.817, 216.820, 216.823, 216.825, 216.827, 216.830, 216.833, 216.835, 216.837, 216.840, 216.843, 216.845, 216.847, 216.850, 216.853, 216B.300, 216B.303, 216B.305, 216B.306, 216B.310, 216B.315, 216B.320, and 216B.459.
Title
AN ACT relating to operations of the Cabinet for Health and Family Services.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-05 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading W/scs 1, sfa 1 RSN# 919 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-14 | House | reported favorably, 2nd reading, to Rules with Committee Substitute (1) |
2019-03-13 | House | returned to Health and Family Services (H) |
2019-03-13 | House | 1st reading |
2019-03-13 | House | taken from Health and Family Services (H) |
2019-03-12 | House | posted in committee |
2019-03-07 | House | to Health and Family Services (H) |
2019-03-06 | House | received in House |
2019-03-05 | Senate | 3rd reading, passed 36-0 with Committee Substitute (1) floor amendment (1) |
2019-03-04 | Senate | floor amendment (1) filed to Committee Substitute |
2019-03-04 | Senate | passed over and retained in the Orders of the Day |
2019-03-01 | Senate | passed over and retained in the Orders of the Day |
2019-03-01 | Senate | taken from the Consent Orders of the Day, placed in the Regular Orders of the Day |
2019-03-01 | Senate | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Friday, March 1, 2019 |
2019-02-28 | Senate | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2019-02-27 | Senate | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar with Committee Substitute (1) |
2019-02-15 | Senate | to Health & Welfare (S) |
2019-02-13 | Senate | introduced in Senate |