KY SB193 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 30 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-30 - signed by Governor (Acts, ch. 81)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [MS Word]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 30 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-30 - signed by Governor (Acts, ch. 81)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [MS Word]
Summary
Amend KRS 45A.850 to allow the executive director to recommend to the Secretary of the Finance and Administration Cabinet as a managing underwriter the Kentucky underwriter which received the highest score for specific bond transactions.
Title
AN ACT relating to bond transactions.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-30 | Senate | signed by Governor (Acts, ch. 81) |
2015-03-24 | Senate | delivered to Governor |
2015-03-24 | Senate | enrolled, signed by each presiding officer |
2015-03-24 | Senate | received in Senate |
2015-03-24 | House | 3rd reading, passed 97-0 |
2015-03-23 | House | placed in the Orders of the Day for Tuesday, March 24, 2015 |
2015-03-23 | House | taken from Rules |
2015-03-23 | House | reported favorably, 2nd reading, to Rules |
2015-03-11 | House | posting waived |
2015-03-10 | House | returned to Appropriations & Revenue (H) |
2015-03-10 | House | 1st reading |
2015-03-10 | House | taken from Appropriations & Revenue (H) |
2015-03-10 | House | to Appropriations & Revenue (H) |
2015-03-09 | House | received in House |
2015-03-04 | Senate | 3rd reading, passed 35-0 with Committee Substitute |
2015-03-03 | Senate | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Wednesday, March 4, 2015 |
2015-02-27 | Senate | 2nd reading |
2015-02-26 | Senate | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar with Committee Substitute |
2015-02-19 | Senate | to Appropriations & Revenue (S) |
2015-02-13 | Senate | introduced in Senate |