KY SB193 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on March 27 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-27 - signed by Governor (Acts ch. 60)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on March 27 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-27 - signed by Governor (Acts ch. 60)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Amend KRS 158.849 to establish a goal of increasing participation in computer science courses by underrepresented groups; require the Department of Education to submit an annual report on public school students participating in computer science courses.
Title
AN ACT relating to educational goals.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-19 - House - House: For Consent RCS# 320 (Y: 83 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2020-03-03 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading W/scs1, scta1 RSN# 1267 (Y: 37 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-03 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading W/scs1, scta1 RSN# 1267 (Y: 37 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-27 | Senate | signed by Governor (Acts ch. 60) |
2020-03-19 | Senate | delivered to Governor |
2020-03-19 | Senate | enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House |
2020-03-19 | Senate | enrolled, signed by President of the Senate |
2020-03-19 | Senate | received in Senate |
2020-03-19 | House | 3rd reading, passed 83-1 |
2020-03-18 | House | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Thursday, March 19, 2020 |
2020-03-17 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2020-03-12 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar |
2020-03-09 | House | posted in committee |
2020-03-06 | House | reassigned to Small Business & Information Technology (H) |
2020-03-05 | House | to Education (H) |
2020-03-03 | House | received in House |
2020-03-03 | Senate | 3rd reading, passed 37-1 with Committee Substitute (1) and committee amendment (1-title) |
2020-03-02 | Senate | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Tuesday, March 3, 2020 |
2020-02-28 | Senate | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2020-02-27 | Senate | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar with Committee Substitute (1) and committee amendment (1-title) |
2020-02-24 | Senate | to Education (S) |
2020-02-20 | Senate | introduced in Senate |