KY SB2 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Introduced on January 2 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-09 - recommitted to State & Local Government (S)
Pending: Senate State & Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 2 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-09 - recommitted to State & Local Government (S)
Pending: Senate State & Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
Propose amendment to Section 54 of the Constitution of Kentucky to allow the General Assembly the power to limit damages for injuries resulting in death or for injuries to persons or property, and to provide a uniform statute of limitations; provide for submission to the voters.
Title
AN ACT proposing an amendment to Section 54 of the Constitution of Kentucky.
Sponsors
Sen. Ralph Alvarado [R] | Sen. Danny Carroll [R] | Sen. Rick Girdler [R] | Sen. Paul Hornback [R] |
Sen. Stephen Meredith [R] | Sen. Dan Seum [R] | Sen. Damon Thayer [R] | Sen. Mike Wilson [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-09 | Senate | recommitted to State & Local Government (S) |
2018-03-08 | Senate | passed over and retained in the Orders of the Day |
2018-03-07 | Senate | passed over and retained in the Orders of the Day |
2018-03-06 | Senate | passed over and retained in the Orders of the Day |
2018-03-05 | Senate | passed over and retained in the Orders of the Day |
2018-03-02 | Senate | passed over and retained in the Orders of the Day |
2018-03-01 | Senate | passed over and retained in the Orders of the Day |
2018-02-28 | Senate | passed over and retained in the Orders of the Day |
2018-02-27 | Senate | passed over and retained in the Orders of the Day |
2018-02-26 | Senate | passed over and retained in the Orders of the Day |
2018-02-23 | Senate | floor amendment (1) filed to Committee Substitute |
2018-02-23 | Senate | passed over and retained in the Orders of the Day |
2018-02-22 | Senate | passed over and retained in the Orders of the Day |
2018-02-21 | Senate | passed over and retained in the Orders of the Day |
2018-02-20 | Senate | passed over and retained in the Orders of the Day |
2018-02-16 | Senate | passed over and retained in the Orders of the Day |
2018-02-15 | Senate | passed over and retained in the Orders of the Day |
2018-02-14 | Senate | passed over and retained in the Orders of the Day |
2018-02-13 | Senate | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Wednesday, February 14, 2018 |
2018-02-08 | Senate | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2018-02-07 | Senate | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar with Committee Substitute (1) |
2018-01-03 | Senate | to State & Local Government (S) |
2018-01-02 | Senate | introduced in Senate |