KY SB2 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 28 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-04 - returned to Judiciary (H)
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 28 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-04 - returned to Judiciary (H)
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Create a new section of KRS Chapter 26A to allow appointment of a special judge in certain civil actions.
Title
AN ACT relating to civil actions.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-28 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading W/scs 1, sfa 3 RSN# 882 (Y: 26 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-04 | House | returned to Judiciary (H) |
2019-03-04 | House | 1st reading |
2019-03-04 | House | taken from Judiciary (H) |
2019-03-01 | House | posted in committee |
2019-03-01 | House | to Judiciary (H) |
2019-02-28 | House | received in House |
2019-02-28 | Senate | passed 26-9 with Committee Substitute (1) and floor amendment (3) |
2019-02-28 | Senate | floor amendments (1) and (2) withdrawn |
2019-02-28 | Senate | 3rd reading |
2019-02-27 | Senate | floor amendment (3) filed to Committee Substitute |
2019-02-27 | Senate | passed over and retained in the Orders of the Day |
2019-02-26 | Senate | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Wednesday, February 27, 2019 |
2019-02-25 | Senate | floor amendment (1) filed, floor amendment (2) filed to Committee Substitute |
2019-02-25 | Senate | reported favorably, 2nd reading, to Rules with Committee Substitute (1) |
2019-02-20 | Senate | returned to Judiciary (S) |
2019-02-20 | Senate | 1st reading |
2019-02-20 | Senate | taken from Judiciary (S) |
2019-02-05 | Senate | to Judiciary (S) |
2019-01-11 | Senate | introduced in Senate |