KY SB20 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 2 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-09 - posted in committee
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 2 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-09 - posted in committee
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
Amend KRS 216C.010 to define "affidavit of merit"; create new section of Chapter 216C to require filing of medical malpractice action with an affidavit of merit; amend KRS 422.317 to regulate fees charged by a hospital or health care provider to provide a copy of medical records; create a new section of KRS Chapter 216C to limit a claimant's attorney fees in a malpractice claim against a health care provider; amend KRS 216C.030 and 311.377 to conform; create a new section of the Kentucky Rules of Evidence to prohibit the introduction of expressions of sympathy, compassion, commiseration, or a general sense of benevolence in medical malpractice actions.
Title
AN ACT relating to health care providers.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-01 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading W/SFA 1, SFA 2, SFA 3 RSN# 486 (Y: 20 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-03-01 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RSN# 486 (Y: 20 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-03-01 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RSN# 486 (Y: 20 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-09 | House | posted in committee |
2018-03-06 | House | to Judiciary (H) |
2018-03-02 | House | received in House |
2018-03-01 | Senate | 3rd reading, passed 20-16 with floor amendments (1) (2) and (3) |
2018-02-28 | Senate | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Thursday, March 1, 2018 |
2018-02-23 | Senate | floor amendment (3) filed |
2018-02-15 | Senate | floor amendment (2) filed |
2018-02-12 | Senate | floor amendment (1) filed |
2018-02-08 | Senate | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2018-02-07 | Senate | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar |
2018-01-04 | Senate | to Health & Welfare (S) |
2018-01-03 | Senate | introduced in Senate |