KY SB215 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 14 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-14 - received in House
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 14 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-14 - received in House
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
Create the Kentucky Coal Fields Endowment Fund, to be used for the purpose of supporting efforts to diversify the economy of the coal fields within Kentucky; create the Kentucky Coal Fields Endowment Fund authority to determine who received disbursements from the fund; appropriate $7,500,000 annually for the fund.
Title
AN ACT relating to the Kentucky Coal Fields Endowment Authority and making an appropriation therefor.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-14 | House | received in House |
2017-03-08 | Senate | 3rd reading, passed 37-0 with committee amendment (1-title) and Committee Substitute |
2017-03-07 | Senate | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Wednesday, March 8, 2017 |
2017-03-07 | Senate | reported favorably, to Rules with Committee Substitute and committee amendment (1-title) as a consent bill |
2017-02-24 | Senate | returned to Appropriations & Revenue (S) |
2017-02-24 | Senate | 2nd reading |
2017-02-24 | Senate | taken from Appropriations & Revenue (S) |
2017-02-23 | Senate | returned to Appropriations & Revenue (S) |
2017-02-23 | Senate | 1st reading |
2017-02-23 | Senate | taken from Appropriations & Revenue (S) |
2017-02-16 | Senate | to Appropriations & Revenue (S) |
2017-02-15 | Senate | introduced in Senate |