KY SB217 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 6 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-20 - WITHDRAWN
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [MS Word]
Status: Introduced on March 6 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-20 - WITHDRAWN
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [MS Word]
Summary
Amend KRS 132.200 to exempt new recreational vehicles held in a retailer's inventory for sale under a floor plan financing arrangement from local property taxation; EFFECTIVE January 1, 2015.
Title
AN ACT relating to the property tax on recreational vehicles held for sale.
Sponsors
Sen. Ray Jones [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-20 | Senate | WITHDRAWN |
2014-03-20 | Senate | WITHDRAWN |
2014-03-20 | Senate | WITHDRAWN |
2014-03-20 | Senate | WITHDRAWN |
2014-03-20 | Senate | WITHDRAWN |
2014-03-20 | Senate | WITHDRAWN |
2014-03-20 | Senate | WITHDRAWN |
2014-03-20 | Senate | WITHDRAWN |
2014-03-20 | Senate | WITHDRAWN |
2014-03-20 | Senate | WITHDRAWN |
2014-03-20 | Senate | WITHDRAWN |
2014-03-20 | Senate | WITHDRAWN |
2014-03-20 | Senate | WITHDRAWN |
2014-03-20 | Senate | WITHDRAWN |
2014-03-20 | Senate | WITHDRAWN |
2014-03-20 | Senate | WITHDRAWN |
2014-03-20 | Senate | WITHDRAWN |
2014-03-20 | Senate | WITHDRAWN |
2014-03-20 | Senate | WITHDRAWN |
2014-03-20 | Senate | WITHDRAWN |
2014-03-20 | Senate | WITHDRAWN |
2014-03-20 | Senate | WITHDRAWN |
2014-03-20 | Senate | WITHDRAWN |
2014-03-20 | Senate | WITHDRAWN |
2014-03-20 | Senate | WITHDRAWN |
2014-03-20 | Senate | WITHDRAWN |
2014-03-20 | Senate | WITHDRAWN |
2014-03-20 | Senate | WITHDRAWN |
2014-03-20 | Senate | WITHDRAWN |
2014-03-20 | Senate | WITHDRAWN |
2014-03-20 | Senate | WITHDRAWN |
2014-03-20 | Senate | WITHDRAWN |
2014-03-20 | Senate | WITHDRAWN |
2014-03-20 | Senate | WITHDRAWN |
2014-03-20 | Senate | WITHDRAWN |
2014-03-20 | Senate | WITHDRAWN |
2014-03-20 | Senate | WITHDRAWN |
2014-03-20 | Senate | WITHDRAWN |
2014-03-20 | Senate | WITHDRAWN |
2014-03-20 | Senate | WITHDRAWN |
2014-03-20 | Senate | WITHDRAWN |
2014-03-20 | Senate | WITHDRAWN |
2014-03-20 | Senate | WITHDRAWN |
2014-03-20 | Senate | WITHDRAWN |
2014-03-20 | Senate | WITHDRAWN |
2014-03-11 | Senate | to Appropriations & Revenue (S) |
2014-03-06 | Senate | introduced in Senate |
Kentucky State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/14RS/SB217.htm |
Text | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/14RS/SB217/bill.doc |
Supplement | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/14RS/SB217/LM.doc |