KY SB217 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 9 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-09 - signed by Governor (Acts, ch. 75)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #4) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 9 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-09 - signed by Governor (Acts, ch. 75)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #4) [PDF]
Summary
Amend KRS 35.010, relating to the code of military justice, to clarify definitions; amend KRS 35.070 to change the maximum fine or forfeiture of pay that a commanding officer may impose as well as clarify other nonjudicial punishments; amend KRS 35.125 to clarify who is eligible to serve as a military judge; amend KRS 35.215 to exempt sexual crimes from a statute of limitations; create a new section of KRS Chapter 35 to move those definitions previously found under each individual sexual crime into one statute; create a new section of KRS Chapter 35 to create the crime of sexual harassment; amend KRS 35.681 to remove the definitions related to rape from the statute; create a new section of KRS Chapter 35 to create the crime of rape of a child; amend KRS 35.685 to remove the definitions related to stalking from the statute; amend KRS 35.690 to remove the definitions related to other sexual crimes.
Title
AN ACT relating to military justice.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-09 | Senate | signed by Governor (Acts, ch. 75) |
2016-03-29 | Senate | delivered to Governor |
2016-03-29 | Senate | enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House |
2016-03-28 | Senate | enrolled, signed by President of the Senate |
2016-03-28 | Senate | received in Senate |
2016-03-28 | House | 3rd reading, passed 99-0 |
2016-03-25 | House | placed in the Consent Orders of the Day for Monday, March 28, 2016 |
2016-03-25 | House | taken from the Consent Orders of the Day |
2016-03-24 | House | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Friday, March 25, 2016 |
2016-03-24 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2016-03-23 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar |
2016-03-21 | House | posted in committee |
2016-03-21 | House | reassigned to Veterans, Military Affairs, & Public Safety (H) |
2016-03-07 | House | to Judiciary (H) |
2016-03-04 | House | received in House |
2016-03-03 | Senate | 3rd reading, passed 38-0 |
2016-02-29 | Senate | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Thursday, March 3, 2016 |
2016-02-26 | Senate | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2016-02-25 | Senate | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar |
2016-02-23 | Senate | to Veterans, Military Affairs, & Public Protection (S) |
2016-02-23 | Senate | introduced in Senate |
Kentucky State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/16RS/SB217.htm |
Text | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/16RS/SB217/bill.pdf |
Supplement | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/16RS/SB217/vote_history.pdf |