KY SB233 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 19 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-27 - returned to State Government (H)
Pending: House State Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 19 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-27 - returned to State Government (H)
Pending: House State Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
Amend KRS 12.070 to provide the Governor authority to appoint members to boards and commissions when entities charged with submitting a list of names fail to submit the list.
Title
AN ACT relating to boards and commissions.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-16 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RSN# 548 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-27 | House | returned to State Government (H) |
2018-03-27 | House | 1st reading |
2018-03-27 | House | taken from State Government (H) |
2018-03-22 | House | posting waived |
2018-03-21 | House | to State Government (H) |
2018-03-19 | House | received in House |
2018-03-16 | Senate | 3rd reading, passed 36-0 |
2018-03-15 | Senate | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Friday, March 16, 2018 |
2018-03-15 | Senate | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2018-03-14 | Senate | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar |
2018-03-05 | Senate | to State & Local Government (S) |
2018-03-01 | Senate | introduced in Senate |
Kentucky State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/18RS/SB233.htm |
Text | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/recorddocuments/bill/18RS/SB233/bill.pdf |
Roll Call | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/18RS/SB233/vote_history.pdf |