KY SB238 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 9 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-09 - signed by Governor (Acts, ch. 77)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 9 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-09 - signed by Governor (Acts, ch. 77)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [PDF]
Summary
Amend KRS 205.7685 to remove requirement of ten days' notice when requesting a credit report for purposes of evaluating child support.
Title
AN ACT relating to credit reports.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-09 | Senate | signed by Governor (Acts, ch. 77) |
2016-03-29 | Senate | delivered to Governor |
2016-03-29 | Senate | enrolled, signed by each presiding officer |
2016-03-29 | Senate | passed 35-0 |
2016-03-29 | Senate | Senate concurred in House Committee Substitutes (1) committee amendment (1-title) |
2016-03-29 | Senate | posted for passage for concurrence in House Committee Substitute (1) and committee amendment (1-title) |
2016-03-25 | Senate | received in Senate |
2016-03-25 | House | 3rd reading, passed 97-0 with Committee Substitute (1) committee amendment (1-title) |
2016-03-24 | House | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Friday, March 25, 2016 |
2016-03-24 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2016-03-23 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar with Committee Substitute (1) and committee amendment (1-title) |
2016-03-17 | House | posted in committee |
2016-03-10 | House | to Judiciary (H) |
2016-03-09 | House | received in House |
2016-03-08 | Senate | 3rd reading, passed 37-0 |
2016-03-07 | Senate | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Tuesday, March 8, 2016 |
2016-03-04 | Senate | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2016-03-03 | Senate | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar |
2016-02-29 | Senate | to Judiciary (S) |
2016-02-25 | Senate | introduced in Senate |