KY SB245 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 8 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-08 - signed by Governor (Acts Ch. 143)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 8 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-08 - signed by Governor (Acts Ch. 143)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Amend KRS 403.735, 403.740, 456.050, and 456.060 to require that emergency protective orders and interpersonal protective orders restrain both parties from certain conduct; amend KRS 403.730 and 456.404 to require certain information to be included in ex parte emergency protective orders and interpersonal protective orders.
Title
AN ACT relating to protective orders.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-30 - House - House: Veto Override RCS# 498 (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-03-22 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading W/scs1 RSN# 2187 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-22 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading W/scs1 RSN# 2187 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-08 | Senate | signed by Governor (Acts Ch. 143) |
2022-03-30 | Senate | delivered to Governor |
2022-03-30 | Senate | enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House |
2022-03-30 | Senate | enrolled, signed by President of the Senate |
2022-03-30 | Senate | received in Senate |
2022-03-30 | House | 3rd reading, passed 98-0 |
2022-03-30 | House | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Wednesday, March 30, 2022 |
2022-03-29 | House | returned to Rules |
2022-03-29 | House | taken from the Orders of the Day |
2022-03-29 | House | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Wednesday, March 30, 2022 |
2022-03-29 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2022-03-25 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar |
2022-03-24 | House | to Judiciary (H) |
2022-03-22 | House | to Committee on Committees (H) |
2022-03-22 | House | received in House |
2022-03-22 | Senate | 3rd reading, passed 38-0 with Committee Substitute (1) |
2022-03-21 | Senate | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Tuesday, March 22, 2022 |
2022-03-18 | Senate | 2nd reading, to Rules as a consent bill |
2022-03-17 | Senate | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar with Committee Substitute (1) |
2022-03-01 | Senate | to Judiciary (S) |
2022-02-28 | Senate | to Committee on Committees (S) |
2022-02-28 | Senate | introduced in Senate |