KY SB249 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 15 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-22 - returned to Agriculture (S)
Pending: Senate Agriculture Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 15 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-22 - returned to Agriculture (S)
Pending: Senate Agriculture Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Amend KRS 438.305 to define "proof of age"; amend KRS 438.310 to restrict the sale of tobacco and vapor products to persons under the age of 21; amend KRS 438.311 to make it unlawful for persons under 21 to buy tobacco or vapor products; amend KRS 438.313 to restrict the wholesale, retail, or manufacturer distribution of tobacco or vapor products to persons under 21; amend KRS 438.315 to raise the minimum age for vending machine sales of tobacco or vapor products; amend KRS 438.325 to establish new age limits regarding tobacco or vapor product retail notifications; amend KRS 438.330 to set new tobacco and vapor product enforcement standards; amend KRS 438.350 regarding possession of tobacco or vapor products by a person under age 21.
Title
AN ACT relating to the sale of tobacco products.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-22 | Senate | returned to Agriculture (S) |
2019-02-22 | Senate | 2nd reading |
2019-02-22 | Senate | taken from Agriculture (S) |
2019-02-21 | Senate | returned to Agriculture (S) |
2019-02-21 | Senate | 1st reading |
2019-02-21 | Senate | taken from Agriculture (S) |
2019-02-19 | Senate | to Agriculture (S) |
2019-02-15 | Senate | introduced in Senate |
Subjects
Kentucky State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://apps.legislature.ky.gov/record/19RS/sb249.html |
Text | https://apps.legislature.ky.gov/recorddocuments/bill/19RS/sb249/orig_bill.pdf |