KY SB255 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 4 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-04 - signed by Governor (Acts Ch. 53)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 4 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-04 - signed by Governor (Acts Ch. 53)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Retain original provisions; require a social worker to make a reasonable attempt to verify the identity of a client; require the use of non-public facing HIPAA compliant technology products.
Title
AN ACT relating to social work.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-27 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading W/FINAL hcs1 hfa2 RSN# 3108 (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-03-26 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 360 (Y: 88 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2024-03-07 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RSN# 2970 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-03-26 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 360 (Y: 88 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2024-03-07 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RSN# 2970 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-04 | Senate | signed by Governor (Acts Ch. 53) |
2024-03-28 | Senate | delivered to Governor |
2024-03-28 | Senate | enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House |
2024-03-27 | Senate | enrolled, signed by President of the Senate |
2024-03-27 | Senate | passed 35-0 with Committee Substitute (1) and Floor Amendment (2) |
2024-03-27 | Senate | Senate concurred in House Committee Substitute (1) and Floor Amendment (2) |
2024-03-27 | Senate | posted for passage for concurrence in House Floor Amendment (2) and Committee Substitute (1) |
2024-03-26 | Senate | to Rules (S) |
2024-03-26 | Senate | received in Senate |
2024-03-26 | House | 3rd reading, passed 88-0 with Committee Substitute (1) and Floor Amendment (2) |
2024-03-21 | House | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Friday, March 22, 2024 |
2024-03-21 | House | floor amendments (1) and (2) filed to Committee Substitute |
2024-03-15 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2024-03-14 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar with Committee Substitute (1) |
2024-03-12 | House | to Families & Children (H) |
2024-03-08 | House | to Committee on Committees (H) |
2024-03-08 | House | received in House |
2024-03-07 | Senate | 3rd reading, passed 37-0 |
2024-03-06 | Senate | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Thursday, March 07, 2024 |
2024-03-05 | Senate | reported favorably, 2nd reading, to Rules as a consent bill |
2024-02-26 | Senate | returned to Families & Children (S) |
2024-02-26 | Senate | 1st reading |
2024-02-26 | Senate | taken from Families & Children (S) |
2024-02-26 | Senate | to Families & Children (S) |
2024-02-22 | Senate | to Committee on Committees (S) |
2024-02-22 | Senate | introduced in Senate |