KY SB26 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on January 21 2010 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-01-26 - to Appropriations & Revenue (H)
Pending: House Appropriations and Revenue Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [MS Word]
Status: Engrossed on January 21 2010 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-01-26 - to Appropriations & Revenue (H)
Pending: House Appropriations and Revenue Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [MS Word]
Summary
Amend KRS 278.600 to define "storage" and amend a definition to require that nuclear power facilities have a plan for the storage of nuclear waste rather than a means for permanent disposal; amend KRS 278.610 to delete the requirement that the Public Service Commission certify the facility as having a means for disposal of high-level nuclear waste; change all references to the disposal of nuclear waste to the storage of nuclear waste; prohibit construction of low-level waste disposal sites in the Commonwealth except as provided in KRS 211.852; require the Public Service Commission to determine whether the construction or operation of a nuclear power facility, including ones constructed by entities regulated under KRS Chapter 96, would create low-level nuclear waste or mixed wastes that would be required to be disposed of in low-level nuclear waste disposal sites in the Commonwealth; repeal KRS 278.605.
Title
AN ACT relating to nuclear power.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-01-26 | to Appropriations & Revenue (H) | |
2010-01-21 | received in House | |
2010-01-20 | 3rd reading, passed 27-10 | |
2010-01-20 | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Wednesday, January 20, 2010 | |
2010-01-14 | 2nd reading, to Rules | |
2010-01-13 | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar | |
2010-01-06 | to Natural Resources and Energy (S) | |
2010-01-05 | introduced in Senate |
Kentucky State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/10RS/SB26.htm |
Text | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/10RS/SB26/bill.doc |