KY SB265 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 9 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-09 - signed by Governor (Acts Ch. 124)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 9 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-09 - signed by Governor (Acts Ch. 124)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Creates a new section of KRS Chapter 161 to establish a teacher induction and mentor program, to require that the Education Professional Standards Board develop standards and guidance for the program, develop evaluations for new teachers, and submit an annual report to the Legislative Research Commission; amends KRS 161.030 to direct that an individual who completes a preparation program and passes the required assessments shall receive a five-year professional certificate, to provide that an out-of-state teacher who passes the required assessments shall receive a five-year professional certificate, to remove the provisions for a teacher internship requirement, and to direct that teacher certification be awarded upon successful completion of an educator preparation program or alternative certification pathway and passing of the required assessment and not be dependent on employment except for emergency certificates; amends KRS 161.048 to modify the Option 7 alternative teacher certification pathway, to remove some initial candidate requirements, to allow provisional certification upon qualifying and enrolling in an approved institute, and to establish conditions for receiving a professional certificate; repeals KRS 161.1222 relating to the pilot teacher internship program; and amends sections of KRS Chapter 161 to conform.
Title
AN ACT relating to teacher certification and declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-28 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading W/FINAL hcs1 hfa1 RSN# 3157 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-27 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 392 (Y: 90 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2024-03-06 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading W/scs1 scta1 RSN# 2962 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-27 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 392 (Y: 90 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2024-03-06 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading W/scs1 scta1 RSN# 2962 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-09 | Senate | signed by Governor (Acts Ch. 124) |
2024-03-28 | Senate | delivered to Governor |
2024-03-28 | Senate | enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House |
2024-03-28 | Senate | enrolled, signed by President of the Senate |
2024-03-28 | Senate | passed 38-0 with Committee Substitute (1) and Floor Amendment (1) |
2024-03-28 | Senate | Senate concurred in House Committee Substitute (1) and Floor Amendment (1) |
2024-03-28 | Senate | posted for passage for concurrence in House Floor Amendment (1) and Committee Substitute (1) |
2024-03-27 | Senate | received in Senate |
2024-03-27 | House | 3rd reading, passed 90-0 with Committee Substitute (1) and Floor Amendment (1) |
2024-03-26 | House | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Wednesday, March 27, 2024 |
2024-03-25 | House | floor amendment (1) filed to Committee Substitute |
2024-03-22 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2024-03-21 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar with Committee Substitute (1) |
2024-03-08 | House | to Education (H) |
2024-03-07 | House | to Committee on Committees (H) |
2024-03-07 | House | received in House |
2024-03-06 | Senate | 3rd reading, passed 38-0 with Committee Substitute (1) and Committee Amendment (1-title) |
2024-03-01 | Senate | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Wednesday, March 06, 2024 |
2024-03-01 | Senate | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2024-02-29 | Senate | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar with Committee Substitute (1) and Committee Amendment (1-title) |
2024-02-26 | Senate | to Education (S) |
2024-02-23 | Senate | to Committee on Committees (S) |
2024-02-23 | Senate | introduced in Senate |