KY SB297 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 17 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-22 - to Labor & Industry (H)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 17 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-22 - to Labor & Industry (H)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
Amend KRS 351.160 to delete references to inspections by state coal mine inspectors; repeal KRS 351.140 and 351.150; EMERGENCY.
Title
AN ACT relating to mine safety and declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-22 | House | to Labor & Industry (H) |
2016-03-17 | House | received in House |
2016-03-17 | Senate | 3rd reading, passed 25-11 with Committee Substitute (1) and floor amendment (1) |
2016-03-16 | Senate | floor amendment (1) filed to Committee Substitute |
2016-03-16 | Senate | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Thursday, March 17, 2016 |
2016-03-10 | Senate | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2016-03-09 | Senate | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar with Committee Substitute (1) |
2016-03-07 | Senate | to Natural Resources & Energy (S) |
2016-03-03 | Senate | introduced in Senate |