KY SB302 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 27 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-03-15 - returned to Licensing & Occupations (S)
Pending: Senate Licensing and Occupations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 27 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-03-15 - returned to Licensing & Occupations (S)
Pending: Senate Licensing and Occupations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Amend KRS 230.760 to add gender-neutral language.
Title
AN ACT relating to the Kentucky Horse Racing Commission.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-15 | Senate | returned to Licensing & Occupations (S) |
2024-03-15 | Senate | 2nd reading |
2024-03-15 | Senate | taken from Licensing & Occupations (S) |
2024-03-14 | Senate | returned to Licensing & Occupations (S) |
2024-03-14 | Senate | 1st reading |
2024-03-14 | Senate | taken from Licensing & Occupations (S) |
2024-02-29 | Senate | to Licensing & Occupations (S) |
2024-02-27 | Senate | to Committee on Committees (S) |
2024-02-27 | Senate | introduced in Senate |
Subjects
Kentucky State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://apps.legislature.ky.gov/record/24RS/sb302.html |
Text | https://apps.legislature.ky.gov/recorddocuments/bill/24RS/sb302/orig_bill.pdf |