KY SB346 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 28 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-03-01 - to State & Local Government (S)
Pending: Senate State & Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 28 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-03-01 - to State & Local Government (S)
Pending: Senate State & Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Amend KRS 14.250 to require the Secretary of State (SOS) to develop, operate, and maintain the Kentucky One-Stop Business Portal (Portal) to facilitate interaction among businesses and governmental agencies in the Commonwealth; mandate that certain elements be included in the development of the Portal; require the framework and informational exchange process to be updated by January 1, 2025; provide for the information and capabilities of the Portal and require the SOS to make the Portal available for public use no later than January 1, 2026; require the SOS to establish a system of universal industry codes to match businesses with their regulatory agencies; require that executive branch agencies integrate licensing and regulatory compliance with the Portal no later than January 1, 2026; require the SOS to establish a call center to provide user services related to the Portal; require the SOS to report to the Legislative Research Commission on the progress of the Portal before June 30, 2026 and each year thereafter; provide that the SOS may adopt administrative regulations to implement the Portal; amend KRS 14.255 to require the SOS to establish a unique Commonwealth business identification number for filings and services; require state agencies integrated with the Portal to use Commonwealth business identification numbers no later than January 1, 2026; amend KRS 11.202 and 147A.032 to conform.
Title
AN ACT relating to business regulation.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-01 | Senate | to State & Local Government (S) |
2024-02-28 | Senate | to Committee on Committees (S) |
2024-02-28 | Senate | introduced in Senate |
Subjects
Commerce
Corporations
Economic Development
Labor and Industry
Licensing
Occupations and Professions
Partnerships
Purchasing
Reports Mandated
Secretary of State
Small Business
State Agencies
Taxation
Unemployment Compensation
Corporations
Economic Development
Labor and Industry
Licensing
Occupations and Professions
Partnerships
Purchasing
Reports Mandated
Secretary of State
Small Business
State Agencies
Taxation
Unemployment Compensation
Kentucky State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://apps.legislature.ky.gov/record/24RS/sb346.html |
Text | https://apps.legislature.ky.gov/recorddocuments/bill/24RS/sb346/orig_bill.pdf |