KY SB347 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 14 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-14 - received in Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 14 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-14 - received in Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Create a new section of KRS Chapter 174 to require the Transportation Cabinet to develop an electric vehicle infrastructure development plan to describe how the state will administer the National Electric Vehicle infrastructure Formula Program funds; identify required elements of the plan; require presentation of the plan to the Interim Joint Committee on Transportation; EMERGENCY.
Title
AN ACT relating to electric vehicle infrastructure development and declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-14 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 563 (Y: 92 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-03-14 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RSN# 2123 (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-03-14 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RSN# 2123 (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-14 | Senate | received in Senate |
2022-04-14 | House | 3rd reading, passed 92-3 with Committee Substitute (2) and Floor Amendment (2-title) |
2022-04-14 | House | placed in the Orders of the Day |
2022-04-14 | House | taken from Rules |
2022-04-14 | House | reported favorably, to Rules with Committee Substitute (2) |
2022-04-13 | House | recommitted to Transportation (H) |
2022-04-13 | House | taken from the Orders of the Day |
2022-03-30 | House | floor amendments (3) and (4-title) filed |
2022-03-29 | House | floor amendment (1) filed to Committee Substitute , floor amendment (2-title) filed to bill |
2022-03-25 | House | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Tuesday, March 29, 2022 |
2022-03-25 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2022-03-24 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar with Committee Substitute (1) and Committee Amendment (1-title) |
2022-03-18 | House | to Transportation (H) |
2022-03-14 | House | to Committee on Committees (H) |
2022-03-14 | House | received in House |
2022-03-14 | Senate | 3rd reading, passed 35-0 |
2022-03-11 | Senate | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Monday, March 14, 2022 |
2022-03-10 | Senate | 2nd reading, to Rules as a consent bill |
2022-03-09 | Senate | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar |
2022-03-07 | Senate | to Transportation (S) |
2022-03-03 | Senate | to Committee on Committees (S) |
2022-03-03 | Senate | introduced in Senate |
Subjects
Effective Dates, Emergency
Federal Laws and Regulations
General Assembly
Highways, Streets, and Bridges
Motor Vehicles
State Agencies
Transportation
Federal Laws and Regulations
General Assembly
Highways, Streets, and Bridges
Motor Vehicles
State Agencies
Transportation