KY SB38 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 12-2)
Status: Engrossed on January 26 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-17 - discharge petition filed
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [MS Word]
Status: Engrossed on January 26 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-17 - discharge petition filed
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [MS Word]
Summary
Create a new section of KRS Chapter 311 to specify how the phrase "individual, private setting" shall be interpreted in informed consent situations; create a new section of KRS Chapter 311 to require an ultrasound prior to an abortion; amend KRS 311.990 to provide a criminal penalty.
Title
AN ACT relating to full disclosure in public safety.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-17 | discharge petition filed | |
2010-03-03 | posting withdrawn | |
2010-02-23 | posted in committee | |
2010-02-01 | to Health & Welfare (H) | |
2010-01-26 | received in House | |
2010-01-25 | passed 32-4 with Committee Substitute | |
2010-01-25 | floor amendments (1) and (2-title) ruled not germane | |
2010-01-25 | 3rd reading | |
2010-01-25 | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Monday, January 25, 2010 | |
2010-01-21 | floor amendment (1) filed to Committee Substitute, floor amendment (2-title) filed | |
2010-01-15 | 2nd reading, to Rules | |
2010-01-14 | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar with Committee Substitute | |
2010-01-06 | to Judiciary (S) | |
2010-01-05 | introduced in Senate |
Kentucky State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/10RS/SB38.htm |
Text | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/10RS/SB38/bill.doc |