KY SB38 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 22 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-22 - signed by Governor (Acts Ch. 57)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 22 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-22 - signed by Governor (Acts Ch. 57)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Create a new section of KRS Chapter 216B to define terms and direct the Cabinet for Health and Family Services to promulgate administrative regulations requiring the use of a smoke evacuation system during any surgical procedure that is likely to produce surgical smoke; amend KRS 216B.990 to establish penalties.
Title
AN ACT relating to surgical smoke evacuation.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-12 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 276 (Y: 91 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2021-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RSN# 1526 (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RSN# 1526 (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-22 | Senate | signed by Governor (Acts Ch. 57) |
2021-03-12 | Senate | delivered to Governor |
2021-03-12 | Senate | enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House |
2021-03-12 | Senate | enrolled, signed by President of the Senate |
2021-03-12 | Senate | received in Senate |
2021-03-12 | House | 3rd reading, passed 91-2 |
2021-03-05 | House | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Thursday, March 11, 2021 |
2021-03-05 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2021-03-04 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar |
2021-03-01 | House | posted in committee |
2021-02-25 | House | to Health & Family Services (H) |
2021-02-04 | House | to Committee on Committees (H) |
2021-02-04 | House | received in House |
2021-02-03 | Senate | 3rd reading, passed 35-0 |
2021-02-02 | Senate | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Wednesday, February 3, 2021 |
2021-02-02 | Senate | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2021-01-13 | Senate | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar |
2021-01-08 | Senate | to Health & Welfare (S) |
2021-01-05 | Senate | to Committee on Committees (S) |
2021-01-05 | Senate | introduced in Senate |
2020-10-30 | Senate | Prefiled by the sponsor(s). |
Subjects
Administrative Regulations and Proceedings
Health and Medical Services
Hospitals and Nursing Homes
Nurses
Physicians and Practitioners
Health and Medical Services
Hospitals and Nursing Homes
Nurses
Physicians and Practitioners