KY SB41 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 11 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-02-24 - posted in committee
Pending: House Elections, Const. Amendments & Intergovernmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [MS Word]
Status: Engrossed on February 11 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-02-24 - posted in committee
Pending: House Elections, Const. Amendments & Intergovernmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [MS Word]
Summary
Amend KRS 116.055 to permit a registered independent to vote in the primary of one party for each primary and to require that an independent be registered as an independent on December 31 immediately preceding the primary; amend KRS 118.125 to prohibit a primary candidate from being a registered independent; amend KRS 117.125 to require that electronic voting machines be reprogrammed to allow a registered independent to vote for a party's candidates in a primary; amend KRS 118.015 to define "registered independent" as a person who is not a member of a political party, a political organization, or a political group.
Title
AN ACT relating to elections.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-02-24 | posted in committee | |
2011-02-14 | to Elections, Const. Amendments & Intergovernmental Affairs (H) | |
2011-02-11 | received in House | |
2011-02-10 | 3rd reading, passed 23-13 with Committee Substitute, floor amendment (1) | |
2011-02-09 | floor amendment (1) filed to Committee Substitute | |
2011-02-09 | passed over and retained in the Orders of the Day | |
2011-02-09 | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Wednesday, February 9, 2011 | |
2011-02-02 | reported favorably, 2nd reading, to Rules with Committee Substitute | |
2011-02-01 | returned to State & Local Government (S) | |
2011-02-01 | 1st reading | |
2011-02-01 | taken from State & Local Government (S) | |
2011-01-06 | to State & Local Government (S) | |
2011-01-04 | introduced in Senate |
Kentucky State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/11RS/SB41.htm |
Text | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/11RS/SB41/bill.doc |