KY SB42 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on March 16 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-16 - signed by Governor (Acts, ch. 23)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on March 16 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-16 - signed by Governor (Acts, ch. 23)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
Amend KRS 431.005 to permit a peace officer to make an arrest for a violation of KRS 508.030, assault in the 4th degree, when the violation occurs in a hospital and the officer has probable cause; amend KRS 431.015 to conform.
Title
AN ACT relating to crimes and punishments.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-16 | Senate | signed by Governor (Acts, ch. 23) |
2017-03-07 | Senate | delivered to Governor |
2017-03-07 | Senate | enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House |
2017-03-07 | Senate | enrolled, signed by President of the Senate |
2017-03-07 | Senate | received in Senate |
2017-03-06 | House | 3rd reading, passed 91-1 |
2017-03-03 | House | taken from the Consent Orders of the Day, placed in the Regular Orders of the Day |
2017-03-02 | House | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Friday, March 3, 2017 |
2017-03-02 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2017-03-01 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar |
2017-02-28 | House | posted in committee |
2017-02-27 | House | to Judiciary (H) |
2017-02-22 | House | received in House |
2017-02-21 | Senate | 3rd reading, passed 38-0 with Committee Substitute |
2017-02-17 | Senate | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Tuesday, February 21, 2017 |
2017-02-10 | Senate | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2017-02-09 | Senate | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar with Committee Substitute |
2017-01-07 | Senate | to Judiciary (S) |
2017-01-03 | Senate | introduced in Senate |
2016-10-14 | Senate | Prefiled by the sponsor(s). |