KY SB5 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 11-1)
Status: Passed on April 13 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-13 - signed by Governor (Acts, ch. 157)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [PDF]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 11-1)
Status: Passed on April 13 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-13 - signed by Governor (Acts, ch. 157)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [PDF]
Summary
Create a new section of KRS Chapter 205 to require the Department for Medicaid Services to directly administer all outpatient pharmacy benefits; prohibit renewal or negotiation of new contracts to provide Medicaid managed care that allow administration of outpatient benefits by any entity but the Department for Medicaid Services; reduce costs of future Medicaid managed care contracts by costs of all outpatient pharmacy benefits as they existed on January 1, 2017; allow the department to utilize managed care principles and techniques to assist with member medication adherence and cost control; require the department to establish a reasonable dispensing fee pursuant to Centers for Medicare and Medicaid Services guidelines; EFFECTIVE January 1, 2019.
Title
AN ACT relating to pharmacy benefits in the Medicaid program.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-04-02 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading W/HCS 1, HFA 2 CONCUR HCTA 2 RSN# 700 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-20 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 365 (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-03-20 - House - House: Suspend the Rules RCS# 364 (Y: 87 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2018-03-01 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading W/SCS 1, SFA 1 RSN# 487 (Y: 32 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-03-20 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 365 (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-03-20 - House - House: Suspend the Rules RCS# 364 (Y: 87 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2018-03-01 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading W/SCS 1, SFA 1 RSN# 487 (Y: 32 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-13 | Senate | signed by Governor (Acts, ch. 157) |
2018-04-02 | Senate | delivered to Governor |
2018-04-02 | Senate | enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House |
2018-04-02 | Senate | enrolled, signed by President of the Senate |
2018-04-02 | Senate | Bill passed 37-0 |
2018-04-02 | Senate | Senate concurred in House Committee Substitute (1), committee amendment (2-title) and floor amendment (2) |
2018-03-29 | Senate | passed over and retained in the Concurrence Orders of the Day |
2018-03-27 | Senate | passed over and retained in the Concurrence Orders of the Day |
2018-03-22 | Senate | posted for passage for concurrence in House Committee Substitute, committee amendments (2-title) & floor amendment (2) |
2018-03-21 | Senate | received in Senate |
2018-03-20 | House | 3rd reading, passed 97-0 with Committee Substitute, committee amendment (2-title), and floor amendment (2) |
2018-03-20 | House | floor amendment (2) filed to Committee Substitute |
2018-03-19 | House | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Tuesday, March 20, 2018 |
2018-03-16 | House | floor amendment (1) filed to Committee Substitute |
2018-03-16 | House | reported favorably, 2nd reading, to Rules with Committee Substitute and committee amendments (1) and (2-title) |
2018-03-15 | House | returned to Banking & Insurance (H) |
2018-03-15 | House | 1st reading |
2018-03-15 | House | taken from Banking & Insurance (H) |
2018-03-13 | House | posted in committee |
2018-03-06 | House | to Banking & Insurance (H) |
2018-03-02 | House | received in House |
2018-03-01 | Senate | 3rd reading, passed 32-4 with Committee Substitute (1) floor amendment (1) |
2018-02-28 | Senate | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Thursday, March 1, 2018 |
2018-02-16 | Senate | floor amendment (1) filed to Committee Substitute |
2018-02-15 | Senate | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2018-02-14 | Senate | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar with Committee Substitute (1) |
2018-01-03 | Senate | to Health & Welfare (S) |
2018-01-02 | Senate | introduced in Senate |
2017-09-25 | Senate | Prefiled by the sponsor(s). |