KY SB57 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 11 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-11 - signed by Governor (Acts ch. 127)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #4) [MS Word]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 11 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-11 - signed by Governor (Acts ch. 127)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #4) [MS Word]
Summary
Amend KRS 213.116, relating to the collecting of data, to require the Cabinet for Health and Family Services to provide on their Web site downloadable forms pertaining to divorces.
Title
AN ACT relating to vital statistics.
Sponsors
Sen. Robin Webb [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-11 | signed by Governor (Acts ch. 127) | |
2012-03-30 | delivered to Governor | |
2012-03-30 | enrolled, signed by each presiding officer | |
2012-03-30 | passed 37-0 | |
2012-03-30 | Senate concurred in House floor amendments (2-title) and (3) | |
2012-03-30 | posted for passage for concurrence in House floor amendments (2-title) and (3) | |
2012-03-23 | received in Senate | |
2012-03-22 | 3rd reading, passed 95-0 with floor amendments (2-title) and (3) | |
2012-03-21 | floor amendment (3) filed | |
2012-03-20 | floor amendments (1) and (2-title) filed | |
2012-03-20 | taken from the Consent Orders of the Day, placed in the Regular Orders of the Day | |
2012-03-20 | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Wednesday, March 21, 2012 | |
2012-03-16 | 2nd reading, to Rules | |
2012-03-15 | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar | |
2012-03-05 | posted in committee | |
2012-02-21 | to Health & Welfare (H) | |
2012-02-16 | received in House | |
2012-02-15 | 3rd reading, passed 37-0 with Committee Substitute | |
2012-02-14 | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Wednesday, February 15, 2012 | |
2012-02-02 | 2nd reading, to Rules | |
2012-02-01 | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar with Committee Substitute | |
2012-01-03 | to Health & Welfare (S) | |
2012-01-03 | introduced in Senate |
Kentucky State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/12RS/SB57.htm |
Text | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/12RS/SB57/bill.doc |