KY SB7 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 23-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 24 2024 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-02-22 - to Education (H)
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on January 24 2024 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-02-22 - to Education (H)
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Amend KRS 164.7874 to include an equivalent score on the Classic Learning Test as a KEES supplemental amount; define "eligible noncertified school graduate"; amend definitions of "KEES award," "KEES award maximum," and " KEES base amount" for an eligible noncertified school graduate; amend KRS 164.7879 to establish an equivalent grade point average for eligible noncertified school graduates based on the graduate's ACT score; amend KRS 164.7884 to conform.
Title
AN ACT relating to KEES scholarships for students attending noncertified schools.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-01-23 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RSN# 2874 (Y: 33 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-22 | House | to Education (H) |
2024-01-24 | House | to Committee on Committees (H) |
2024-01-24 | House | received in House |
2024-01-23 | Senate | 3rd reading, passed 33-4 |
2024-01-19 | Senate | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Tuesday, January 23, 2024 |
2024-01-19 | Senate | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2024-01-18 | Senate | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar |
2024-01-08 | Senate | to Education (S) |
2024-01-04 | Senate | to Committee on Committees (S) |
2024-01-04 | Senate | introduced in Senate |