KY SB73 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 10 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-02-11 - to State Government (H)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 10 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-02-11 - to State Government (H)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
Amend KRS 6.525 to allow members contributing to the Legislators' Retirement Plan prior to January 1, 2014, to make a one-time election to have their benefits from the Legislators' Retirement Plan be based solely on their legislative salary and any salary earned in another state-administered retirement system prior to January 1, 2014.
Title
AN ACT relating to the Legislators' Retirement Plan.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-11 | House | to State Government (H) |
2016-02-10 | House | received in House |
2016-02-09 | Senate | 3rd reading, passed 37-0 |
2016-02-08 | Senate | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Tuesday, February 9 |
2016-02-04 | Senate | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2016-02-03 | Senate | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar |
2016-01-07 | Senate | to State & Local Government (S) |
2016-01-06 | Senate | introduced in Senate |
Kentucky State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/16RS/SB73.htm |
Text | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/16RS/SB73/bill.pdf |
Supplement | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/16RS/SB73/vote_history.pdf |