KY SB73 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 11 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-11 - received in House
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 11 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-11 - received in House
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Amend KRS 344.200. 344.210, 344.240, and 344.600 to extend timelines for actions involvng the Commission on Human Rights.
Title
AN ACT relating to the Kentucky Commission on Human Rights.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RSN# 1539 (Y: 30 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-11 | House | received in House |
2021-02-10 | Senate | 3rd reading, passed 30-1 |
2021-02-10 | Senate | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Wednesday, February 10, 2021 |
2021-02-09 | Senate | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2021-02-04 | Senate | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar |
2021-02-02 | Senate | to Judiciary (S) |
2021-01-05 | Senate | to Committee on Committees (S) |
2021-01-05 | Senate | introduced in Senate |